KY HB301 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - reassigned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 315.136 and KRS 315.138 to require new pharmacy technician applicants and applicants whose registration has been expired for one year or longer to submit to a nationwide criminal background check by the Kentucky State Police and the FBI.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to pharmacy technicians.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30Senatereassigned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2017-03-30Senatetaken from Health & Welfare (S)
2017-03-08Senatereturned to Health & Welfare (S)
2017-03-08Senate2nd reading
2017-03-08Senatetaken from Health & Welfare (S)
2017-03-07Senatereturned to Health & Welfare (S)
2017-03-07Senate1st reading
2017-03-07Senatetaken from Health & Welfare (S)
2017-02-28Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2017-02-28Senatereceived in Senate
2017-02-27House3rd reading, passed 92-0
2017-02-27Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2017-02-24Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 27, 2017
2017-02-24House2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-23Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2017-02-22Houseposted in committee
2017-02-14Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2017-02-10Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback