KY HB298 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 97)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 97)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 61 to provide definitions, require each law enforcement agency in the state to establish and enforce policies governing of a vehicle pursuit after January 1, 2021; provide the criteria for decision-making to initiate and terminate a pursuit; allow the adoption model policy, subject to certain criteria and require transmission of adopted policy to Justice Cabinet; provide for penalties for failure to transmit; require written certification that each member of the agency has received a copy of the policy and instruction on the policy; make policy confidential and not a public record; require annual review of policy; allow update of policy at any time, require submission of revised policy to Justice Cabinet; create a new section of KRS Chapter 411 to prohibit elected law enforcement officers from engaging in vehicle pursuit, provide exemptions for certain officers, provide penalty for violation of this section, define "pursuit"; amend KRS 15.440 to require a mandatory eight hours of in-service training in "emergency vehicle operations" annually; amend KRS 61.170 to provide for punishment of elected law enforcement officials engaging in unauthorized pursuit; amend KRS 186.560 to allow suspension of driver's license for fleeing or evading in the second degree; amend 520.100 to enhance penalties for fleeing or evading in the second degree; naming section 1 of the Act "Jill's Law"; Section 3 EFFECTIVE July 1, 2021.
Title
AN ACT relating to police pursuit policies and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. James Tipton [R] | Rep. Derrick Graham [D] | Rep. Adam Koenig [R] | Rep. Russ Meyer [D] |
Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 388 (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1463 (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 172 (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1463 (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 172 (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 97) |
2020-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-15 | House | passed 73-13 |
2020-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2020-04-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2020-04-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-04-15 | House | to Rules (H) |
2020-04-15 | House | received in House |
2020-04-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 26-5 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, April 15, 2020 |
2020-03-26 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2020-03-19 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-19 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-8 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2) |
2020-02-24 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-24 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-23 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-21 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Charter County Government
Cities
Consolidated Local Governments
Constables
Coroners
Counties
Courts
Driver Licensing
Effective Dates, Delayed
Jails and Jailers
Local Government
Local Mandate
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Records and Reports
Public Safety
Sheriffs
Traffic Safety
Charter County Government
Cities
Consolidated Local Governments
Constables
Coroners
Counties
Courts
Driver Licensing
Effective Dates, Delayed
Jails and Jailers
Local Government
Local Mandate
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Police, City and County
Police, State
Public Records and Reports
Public Safety
Sheriffs
Traffic Safety