KY HB290 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 75)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 75)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.070 to require the state board or the agency designated by the state board to manage interscholastic athletics to allow a member school's team to play against students or a team from non-member, at-home private schools and establish the conditions under which this may occur.
Title
AN ACT relating to interscholastic athletics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 606 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 108 (Y: 76 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 108 (Y: 76 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 75) |
2018-03-22 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 21, 2018 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 76-8 with Committee Substitute |
2018-02-09 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2018-02-08 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 9, 2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2018-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-02 | House | to Education (H) |
2018-01-31 | House | introduced in House |