KY HB290 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 39)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 39)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 620 to establish an external child fatality and near fatality review panel; establish its membership, duties, and responsibilities; and amend KRS 620.050 to allow records to be provided to the panel.
Title
AN ACT relating to the external child fatality and near fatality review panel.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Burch [D] | Rep. Jim Wayne [D] | Rep. Robert Benvenuti [R] | Rep. Martha King [D] |
Rep. Steven Riggs [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] | Rep. Addia Wuchner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 39) |
2013-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-12 | House | passed 100-0 |
2013-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (2) |
2013-03-12 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (2) |
2013-03-12 | House | taken from Rules |
2013-03-12 | House | to Rules (H) |
2013-03-12 | House | received in House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | passed with Committee Substitute (2) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute (1) withdrawn |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-07 | Senate | recommitted to Health & Welfare (S) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2013-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-05 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2013-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (4) |
2013-02-21 | House | floor amendment (4) filed to Committee Substitute |
2013-02-21 | House | floor amendment (3) withdrawn |
2013-02-20 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn |
2013-02-20 | House | floor amendments (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2013-02-19 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 20, 2013 |
2013-02-19 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2013-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-11 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2013-02-08 | House | introduced in House |