KY HB289 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 438 to prohibit indoor smoking in businesses, places of employment, and other listed public places; exempt private residences, unless used for child care or adult day care; permit smoking in designated nonenclosed areas; require posting of "no smoking" signs as specified locations; permit political subdivisions of the Commonwealth to adopt stricter regulations by ordinance; provide for enforcement by all peace officers and health department employees; provide for the issuance of uniform citations for violation; require that employers and others not discriminate against persons reporting violations; provide for fines for violation; provide that fines go to the organization whose employee issued the citation; provide that no court costs or other fees be charged for violations; amend KRS 344.040, relating to unlawful practices by an employer, to add reference to state law, local, ordinance, or local board of health regulation relating to smoking; amend KRS 431.450, relating to uniform citations, to provide for issuing citation forms to health departments; authorize the department of Kentucky State Police to create and issue uniform smoking violation citations; create a new section of KRS Chapter 438 to exempt smoking laboratories where machines do the smoking; repeal various statutes permitting smoking in public buildings.
Title
AN ACT prohibiting smoking in public places and places of employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-03-23 | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-03-20 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2012-03-20 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 21, 2012 | |
2012-03-14 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-13 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-02-22 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-20 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2012-01-19 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB289.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB289/bill.doc |