KY HB286 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-01 - recommitted to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-01 - recommitted to Judiciary (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend various sections in KRS Chapter 189A relating to DUI to replace the current hardship license system with an ignition interlock licensing system.
Title
AN ACT relating to driving under the influence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | House | recommitted to Judiciary (H) |
2013-03-01 | House | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday. Febuary 22, 2013 |
2013-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2013-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-11 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2013-02-07 | House | introduced in House |