KY HB282 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 121)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 121)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 183.090 to require the Department of Aviation to inspect and license only those airports that fall under the definition of a general aviation airport; amend KRS 183.011 to define "general aviation airport."
Title
AN ACT relating to airports.
Sponsors
Rep. John Sims [D] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 319 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 928 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 103 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 928 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 103 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 121) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | passed 97-0 |
2019-03-13 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-12 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-07 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | received in House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-20 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-11 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2019-02-08 | House | introduced in House |