KY HB278 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - placed in the Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - placed in the Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 241 to define "alcohol impact area," and "local government"; permit an alcohol impact area to be designated by a local government by ordinance when established criteria are met; establish voluntary control options and require the local government to attempt to reach a voluntary agreement prior to enacting an ordinance; require local government to notify licensees, require the local government to petition the board to allow more stringent control over the sale of alcoholic beverages within established alcohol impact areas; grant the board 60 days to respond to the petition; allow licensees within an alcohol impact area adequate time to adjust to any limitations; require the local government to report on alcohol impact areas; designate recipients of the report, contents of report, and assign responsibility for the report to the local government administrator with jurisdiction over the alcohol impact area.
Title
AN ACT relating to alcohol impact areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-03-13 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-13 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2014-03-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-30 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | introduced in House |