KY HB274 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 210.235 to specify additional conditions under which patient records may be disclosed.
Title
AN ACT relating to mental health records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | to Rules (H) | |
2012-03-28 | received in House | |
2012-03-27 | 3rd reading, passed 32-4 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2012-03-27 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 27, 2012 | |
2012-03-27 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2012-03-23 | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2012-03-23 | 2nd reading | |
2012-03-23 | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2012-03-22 | reassigned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2012-03-22 | 1st reading | |
2012-03-22 | taken from Judiciary (S) | |
2012-02-14 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2012-02-10 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-10 | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 | |
2012-02-06 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 10, 2012 | |
2012-02-06 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2012-01-23 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-20 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2012-01-18 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB274.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB274/bill.doc |