KY HB271 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 27)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 27)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 7A.200 to 7A.260 to require the state-administered retirement systems to disclose data on each member or recipient of a benefit, including a unique identification number which shall not be the member's Social Security number or personal identification number issued by the systems, information on the retirement status, actual or projected benefits payments, and other retirement information for each member; establish noncodified sections to require the Public Pension Oversight Board to study and provide a report by December 1, 2016, as to whether or not legislative action should be taken to separate the administration of the County Employees Retirement System from the Kentucky Retirement Systems; require the Public Pension Oversight Board to study and provide a report by December 1, 2016, as to whether or not legislative action should be taken to transfer administration of the Judicial Retirement Plan and the Legislators' Retirement Plan to the Kentucky Retirement Systems; require the Public Pension Oversight Board to study and provide a report by December 1, 2016, as to whether or not legislative action should be taken to consolidate administrative and investment functions of all of the state-administered retirement systems, which shall include a review of investment returns, investment expenses, and administrative expenses.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Public Pension Oversight Board.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Miller [R] | Rep. Arnold Simpson [D] | Rep. Kevin Bratcher [R] | Rep. Ron Crimm [R] |
Rep. Jim DeCesare [R] | Rep. Stan Lee [R] | Rep. Phil Moffett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 27) |
2016-03-22 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-22 | House | received in House |
2016-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-03-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2016 (Consent Orders #1) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-16 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-14 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 9, 2016 |
2016-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-04 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-19 | House | to State Government (H) |
2016-01-15 | House | introduced in House |