KY HB268 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - delivered to Secretary of State (KY Acts ch. 193)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - delivered to Secretary of State (KY Acts ch. 193)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 48.050, relating to submission of budget unit requests, to require submission of requests by November 1, rather than November 15.
Title
AN ACT amending the 2018-2020 executive branch biennial budget, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Rudy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1132 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 397 (Y: 53 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 342 (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 980 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 918 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 92 (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 397 (Y: 53 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 342 (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 980 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 918 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 92 (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (KY Acts ch. 193) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | received in House |
2019-03-28 | House | passed 20-17 |
2019-03-28 | House | page 2, lines 18, 19 and 20 vetoes overridden |
2019-03-28 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2019-03-28 | House | received in Senate |
2019-03-28 | Senate | passed 53-38 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | page 16, lines 10, 11, 12 through 21, 22 and 23 vetoes not acted upon |
2019-03-28 | Senate | page 2, lines 18,19 and 20 vetoes overridden |
2019-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2019-03-28 | Senate | received in House |
2019-03-26 | House | line items vetoed |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 76-20 with FCCR (1) |
2019-03-14 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2019-03-14 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Committee Report |
2019-03-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2019-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | passed 36-0 with FCCR (1) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Free Conference Report on Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-07 | House | taken from Rules |
2019-03-06 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | received in House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 5, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-28 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-6 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-20 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-20 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-08 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | introduced in House |