KY HB268 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 19)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 19)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
The Legislative Branch Budget: appropriate from the General Fund $50,883,800 for fiscal year 2012-2013 and $53,800,100 for fiscal year 2013-2014; appropriate from Restricted Funds $53,000 for fiscal year 2012-2013 and $119,300 for fiscal year 2013-2014, with appropriations allocated as follows:
Title
AN ACT making appropriations for the operations, maintenance, and support of the Legislative Branch of the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Sponsors
Rep. Rocky Adkins [D] | Rep. Larry Clark [D] | Rep. Robert Damron [D] | Rep. Rick Rand [D] |
Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] | Rep. Thomas Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 19) | |
2012-03-23 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-03-23 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-03-23 | received in House | |
2012-03-22 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 | |
2012-03-22 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2012 | |
2012-03-22 | reported favorably, to Rules | |
2012-03-20 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-03-20 | 2nd reading | |
2012-03-20 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-03-19 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-03-19 | 1st reading | |
2012-03-19 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-03-13 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-03-08 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-07 | 3rd reading, passed 94-2 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-06 | placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 7, 2012 | |
2012-03-06 | taken from Rules | |
2012-03-06 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-28 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-02-28 | 2nd reading | |
2012-02-28 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-02-27 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-02-27 | 1st reading | |
2012-02-27 | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-02-24 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-18 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-01-17 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB268.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB268/bill.doc |