KY HB263 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - reassigned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - reassigned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 238 to establish a registry of individuals who have been disqualified from serving as a volunteer for a charitable organization; allow licensed charitable organizations to request a copy of the registry up to four times per year; set investigatory powers and appellate rights similar to those for regular charitable gaming violations; limit a volunteer's time on the registry to five continuous years, unless the person has committed another violation; amend KRS 238.520 to increase the size of the Charitable Gaming Advisory Commission to eleven members by adding two additional members from the public at large; enable a member to serve up to two consecutive terms, with possible reappointment following an absence of one term; amend KRS 238.535 to allow a licensee or applicant for a charitable organization license to choose to apply for the issuance or renewal of an annual or biennial license; amend KRS 238.525 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to charitable gaming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | reassigned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-02-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-1 with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 18, 2014 |
2014-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-03 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-28 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2014-01-27 | House | introduced in House |