KY HB263 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Pending: Senate Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 198B.652 to add one member to the Kentucky Board of Heating, Ventilation, and Air Conditioning; specify that the member representing the United Association of Plumbers, Pipefitters, Sprinklerfitters, Steamfitters and Techs shall be a journeyman HVAC mechanic with at least five years of experience; amend KRS 198B.658 to establish requirements for licensing of master and journeyman heating, ventilation, and air conditioning professionals; permit the board to deny a license when a person is convicted of sexual misconduct; amend KRS 198B.664 to provide for license renewal after expiration; extend provisions for inactive license.
Title
AN ACT relating to the licensing of heating, ventilation, and air conditioning professionals.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Cherry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2012-03-07 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-06 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-01 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 2, 2012 | |
2012-03-01 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-29 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-02-10 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-18 | to Licensing & Occupations (H) | |
2012-01-17 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB263.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB263/bill.doc |