KY HB262 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - floor amendment (1) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 7 to require the Commission, with the assistance of the Personnel Cabinet, to establish a job classification and compensation system for non-partisan employees of the Commission by August 1, 2015; require nonpartisan staff to be employed, promoted, disciplined, and dismissed in accordance with that system; require the Personnel Cabinet to advise the Commission on salaries of employees of the General Assembly; require that each nonpartisan employee of the Commission have a personnel file that is accessible to the employee; require the utilization of a deputy director for human resources, and provide that nothing in this section grant rights under KRS Chapter 18A to employees of the Commission; amend KRS 7.090 to require employment of personnel by the Commission to be in accordance with the job classification and compensation system; amend KRS 18A.030 to require the secretary of the Personnel Cabinet to assist the Commission in establishing a job classification and compensation system.
Title
AN ACT relating to the staff of the legislative branch of state government.
Sponsors
Rep. James Kay [D] | Rep. Sannie Overly [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Leslie Combs [D] |
Rep. Kelly Flood [D] | Rep. Derrick Graham [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Russ Meyer [D] |
Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. Arnold Simpson [D] | Rep. Rita Smart [D] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 55-26 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) |
2015-02-26 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2015-02-23 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 24, 2015 |
2015-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-10 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to State Government (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | introduced in House |