KY HB259 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-02 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-02 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 48.020 to remove the requirement that the branch budget recommendation be certified together with the budget statements; amend KRS 48.040 and 48.050 to require the certain budget documents to be submitted on or before October 1 of each odd-numbered year; amend KRS 48.110 to require each branch budget recommendation and all supporting documentation to be submitted in a form and format cooperatively developed by each respective branch of government and the General Assembly and approved by the Legislative Research Commission; amend KRS 48.120 to require the Office of State Budget Director to submit official revenue estimates made by the consensus forecasting group by December 20 of each odd-numbered year; amend KRS 48.170 to allow the standing committees of each house and interim joint committees of the Legislative Research Commission to request additional information and require the information be submitted within 14 days of the request; amend KRS 48.300, 48.810, and 48.950 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to budget requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 75 (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-02-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-15 |
2023-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 23, 2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-02-16 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-14 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Budget and Financial Administration
Fiscal Note
General Assembly
Governor
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies
Fiscal Note
General Assembly
Governor
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies