KY HB259 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 353 to define terms; state legislative findings; direct Energy and Environment Cabinet to seek one to five projects demonstrating injection of carbon dioxide into geologic storage; provide a process for pooling of pore space necessary to create underground carbon storage reservoirs; create a process whereby ownership of and liability for stored carbon dioxide will pass to the federal or state government following a period of monitoring of the storage facility; direct the Energy and Environment Cabinet to undertake discussions with surrounding states concerning accidental migration of geologically stored carbon across state lines; require annual reports.
Title
AN ACT relating to economic development.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. John Short [D] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-03 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-03 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2011-03-02 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-01 | received in House | |
2011-02-28 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2011-02-28 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 28, 2011 | |
2011-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | to Natural Resources and Energy (S) | |
2011-02-15 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-14 | 3rd reading, passed 91-8 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) | |
2011-02-11 | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-11 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 14, 2011 | |
2011-02-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2011-02-07 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-02 | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) | |
2011-02-01 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB259.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB259/bill.doc |