KY HB254 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 164.348 to require public postsecondary institutions to adopt policies ensuring the protection of freedom of speech and expression by students and faculty; require policies to be made available to students and faculty; create a cause of action for a violation of any policy required by the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to freedom of speech at public postsecondary education institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 986 (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 274 (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 30-7
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-13Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-12Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2019-03-12Senate1st reading
2019-03-12Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2019-03-12Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2019-03-12Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-12Housepassed 64-33 with floor amendment (2)
2019-03-07Housefloor amendment (2) filed
2019-03-07Housereturned to the Orders of the Day
2019-03-07House3rd reading
2019-03-04Housefloor amendments (1) filed
2019-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019
2019-02-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-26Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-22Houseposted in committee
2019-02-07Houseto Education (H)
2019-02-06Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback