KY HB248 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 195)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 195)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 48 to prohibit the expenditure of any appropriation in support of a challenge to the constitutionality of any legislative act or resolution of the General Assembly, except in the case of the Attorney General; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the expenditure of appropriated funds and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2343 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 527 (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2315 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 173 (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 527 (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2315 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 173 (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 195) |
2022-04-13 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-04-13 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-04-13 | House | passed 27-8 |
2022-04-13 | House | veto overridden |
2022-04-13 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2022-04-13 | House | to Rules (S) |
2022-04-13 | House | received in Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | passed 73-24 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | veto overridden |
2022-04-13 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2022-04-13 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2022-04-13 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | received in House |
2022-04-06 | House | Vetoed |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-30 | House | received in House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 28-8 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-03-24 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | reassigned to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | 3rd reading, passed 73-22 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-17 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-01-24 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Attorney General
Budget and Financial Administration
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Retroactive Legislation
Budget and Financial Administration
Effective Dates, Emergency
Fiscal Note
Retroactive Legislation