KY HB241 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 214)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 214)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
The Transportation Cabinet Budget: Detail Part I, Operating Budget; appropriate to General Administration and Support: 2021-2022: $1,119,600, 2022-2023: $83,373,900, 2023-2024: $84,567,900; appropriate to Aviation: 2021-2022: $108,100, 2022-2023: $34,947,000, 2023-2024: $31,502,600; appropriate to Debt Service: 2022-2023: $134,925,100, 2023-2024: $136,700,700; appropriate to Highways: 2021-2022: $220,806,300, 2022-2023: $2,468,155,300, 2023-2024: $2,287,084,700; appropriate to Public Transportation: 2021-2022: $117,000, 2022-2023: $46,986,500, 2023-2024: $42,970,600; appropriate to Revenue Sharing: 2021-2022: $214,500, 2022-2023: $422,570,900, 2023-2024: $414,668,100; appropriate to Vehicle Regulation: 2021-2022: $683,200, 2022-2023: $66,976,600, 2023-2024: $68,987,900; not included in the appropriation amounts are capital project amounts as follows: 2021-2022: $3,000,000, 2022-2023: $43,643,000, 2023-2024: $16,850,000; detail Part II, Capital Projects Budget; detail Part III, Transportation Cabinet Budget Summary; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to appropriations providing financing and conditions for the operations, maintenance, support, and functioning of the Transportation Cabinet of the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Petrie [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Randy Bridges [R] | Rep. Matt Lockett [R] |
Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Walker Thomas [R] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2358 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 538 (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 432 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2242 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 37 (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 538 (Y: 73 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 432 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2242 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 37 (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch. 214) |
2022-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-04-13 | Senate | received in House |
2022-04-13 | House | passed 28-8 |
2022-04-13 | House | veto overridden |
2022-04-13 | House | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2022-04-13 | House | to Rules (S) |
2022-04-13 | House | received in Senate |
2022-04-13 | Senate | passed 73-18 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | veto overridden |
2022-04-13 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2022-04-13 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2022-04-13 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2022-04-13 | Senate | received in House |
2022-04-11 | House | line items vetoed |
2022-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-29 | House | passed 91-0 |
2022-03-29 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-29 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | received in House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2022-01-24 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-01-20 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-4 with Committee Substitute |
2022-01-20 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2022-01-20 | House | taken from Rules |
2022-01-20 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2022-01-13 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-13 | House | 2nd reading |
2022-01-13 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-08 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-08 | House | 1st reading |
2022-01-08 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
Capital Construction
Governor
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
State Agencies
Transportation
Budget and Financial Administration
Capital Construction
Governor
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
State Agencies
Transportation