KY HB241 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-12)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 to designate the second Wednesday in February as "Family Resource and Youth Services Center Day."
Title
AN ACT designating the second Wednesday in February as Family Resource and Youth Services Center Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 99 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2020-02-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 11, 2020 |
2020-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-21 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-14 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-01-10 | House | introduced in House |