KY HB241 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 25)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 25)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 363.904 to allow the Governor or the Governor's designee to issue a temporary waiver of ASTM specifications for motor fuel during an emergency that disrupts the motor fuel supply.
Title
AN ACT relating to weights and measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 256 (Y: 76 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 505 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 120 (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 505 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 120 (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 25) |
2018-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-09 | House | passed 76-8 |
2018-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-03-08 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-03-07 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | received in House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 6, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2018-02-15 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 82-10 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), and floor amendment (1) |
2018-02-09 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-02-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 12, 2018 |
2018-02-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-01-30 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-29 | House | reassigned to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2018-01-26 | House | to State Government (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | introduced in House |