KY HB241 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-04 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend various sections of the Kentucky Revised Statutes to reorganize various offices in the Department of Education; repeal KRS 156.017; confirm Executive Order 2012-561.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2013-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2013 |
2013-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-07 | House | to Education (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB241.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB241/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB241/vote_history.pdf |