KY HB240 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 15.315, relating to the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council, to add the president of the Kentucky chapter of the Association of Public Safety Communications Officials and the president of the Kentucky chapter of the National Emergency Number Association to the membership of the council; amend KRS 15.320 to establish quorum of the reconstituted council to 14 members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 128 (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2020-02-20Senatereceived in Senate
2020-02-19House3rd reading, passed 88-4 with floor amendment (1)
2020-02-13Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2020-02-06Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 7, 2020
2020-01-23House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-22Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-16Houseposted in committee
2020-01-14Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2020-01-10Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback