KY HB24 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 023)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 023)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 218A to prohibit any person from possessing one gram or more of pure dextromethorphan or dextromethorphan that has been extracted from solid or liquid form; prohibit sale of products containing dextromethorphan as the only active ingredient to individuals younger than 18; require any person selling a product containing dextromethorphan to require that prospective buyers show a photo ID and sign a document stating the customer is older than 18 before purchase; create an affirmative defense for the retailer if a minor utilizes a fraudulent ID; prohibit individuals younger than 18 from misrepresenting their age and from utilizing a fraudulent ID to purchase or obtain dextromethorphan; establish penalties for violation.
Title
AN ACT relating to dextromethorphan abuse.
Sponsors
Rep. Fitz Steele [D] | Rep. Tim Couch [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 023) |
2015-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2015-03-10 | House | received in House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-2 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2015-03-04 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | 1st reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-1 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-06 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |
2015-11-12 | House | To: Interim Joint Committee on Judiciary |