KY HB235 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.7883 to provide Kentucky Educational Excellence Scholarships eligibility for enrollment in a Navy Reserve Officers Training Corps program at an out-of-state institution located in a state within the Southern Regional Education Board.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Educational Excellence Scholarship.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Lockett [R] | Rep. Jennifer Henson Decker [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Rep. Killian Timoney [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 126 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-03-01 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2021-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-10 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-04 | House | to Education (H) |
2021-01-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-09 | House | introduced in House |