KY HB226 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 092)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 092)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.020 to change the Office of Policy and Budget to the Office of Finance and Budget in the Cabinet for Health and Family Services and add the Office of Legislative and Regulatory Affairs; amend KRS 194A.030 to assign responsibilities of these offices; confirm Executive Order 2016-892.
Title
AN ACT relating to reorganization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 092) |
2017-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-14 | House | passed 85-6 |
2017-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2017-03-07 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1) for Tuesday, March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-06 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-06 | House | received in House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 6, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2017-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 14, 2017 |
2017-02-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-08 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | introduced in House |