KY HB219 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - to Committee on Committees (S)
Pending: Senate Committee on Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - to Committee on Committees (S)
Pending: Senate Committee on Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 to allow the Freedom Flag to be flown as a Flag of Remembrance each September 11.
Title
AN ACT relating to allowing the Freedom Flag to be flown as a Flag of Remembrance each September 11, which is known as Patriot Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 124 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2024-02-20 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 21, 2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-01 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2024-01-10 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-10 | House | introduced in House |