KY HB218 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 157)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 315.0351 and 315.040 to allow a person or pharmacy located outside this Commonwealth to sell or distribute dialysate drugs or devices necessary to perform home peritoneal kidney dialysis to patients with end-stage renal disease, provided that certain criteria are followed; amend KRS 315.400 to change the definition of "wholesale distribution."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to dialysate solutions and devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 353 (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 997 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 96 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 157)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housepassed 86-3
2019-03-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-14Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-14Houseto Rules (H)
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-12Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-07Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-07Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-06Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill
2019-03-05Senatereturned to Health & Welfare (S)
2019-03-05Senate1st reading
2019-03-05Senatetaken from Health & Welfare (S)
2019-02-27Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2019-02-25Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-22House3rd reading, passed 94-1 with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendments (1) and (2-title)
2019-02-15Housefloor amendments (1) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) filed to bill
2019-02-15Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019
2019-02-15House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-14Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-12Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback