KY HB214 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 211)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 211)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new section of KRS Chapter 210 to define “developmental disabilities,” to state legislative findings for the rights of individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities, and to provide that the Act may be cited as the Frank Huffman Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Chad Aull [D] | Rep. Tina Bojanowski [D] | Rep. Adrielle Camuel [D] |
Rep. Beverly Chester-Burton [D] | Rep. Alan Gentry [D] | Rep. Rachel Roarx [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 479 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3129 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 288 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3129 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 288 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 211) |
2024-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-04-15 | House | passed 96-0 |
2024-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-28 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | to Families & Children (S) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2024-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | to State Government (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-09 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Disabilities and the Disabled
Mental Disability
Mental Health
Public Health
Short Titles and Popular Names
Civil Actions
Disabilities and the Disabled
Mental Disability
Mental Health
Public Health
Short Titles and Popular Names