KY HB214 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch.100)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch.100)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 to designate and observe June 30 of every year as "Arthrogryposis Multiplex Congenita Awareness Day."
Title
AN ACT relating to Arthrogryposis Multiplex Congenita.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 580 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 132 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 132 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch.100) |
2018-03-21 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-21 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-21 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-21 | House | received in House |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-16 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 14, 2018 |
2018-02-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-23 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-22 | House | to State Government (H) |
2018-01-18 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB214.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB214/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB214/vote_history.pdf |