KY HB213 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-31 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 214.185 to establish that any qualified mental health professional may provide outpatient mental health counseling to any child who is age 16 or older and is an unaccompanied youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to mental healthcare for unaccompanied youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 44 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-31Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-01-29Senatereceived in Senate
2020-01-28House3rd reading, passed 95-0
2020-01-27Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 28, 2020
2020-01-24House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-23Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-21Houseposted in committee
2020-01-10Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-01-08Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback