KY HB212 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 017)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 017)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 to designate the Kentucky Springseat Saddle (Minihan) as the official saddle of the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Title
AN ACT designating the Kentucky Springseat Saddle (Minihan) as the official saddle of the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 914 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 81 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 81 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 017) |
2019-03-05 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-05 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-04 | House | received in House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-25 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2019-02-15 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-06 | House | to State Government (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | introduced in House |