KY HB204 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 125)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 41.410 to update the requirements to the Developmental Disabilities Assistance and Bill of Rights Act of 2000; create a new section of KRS Chapter 41 to require the Department of the Treasury to be responsible for administering and promoting STABLE Kentucky accounts; amend KRS 393A.020 to state that KRS Chapter 393A shall not apply to mineral proceeds; amend KRS 393A.330 to provide that the holder of virtual currency shall liquidate and remit the proceeds to the administrator, and that the owner shall not have recourse against the holder or the administrator to recover any gain in value that occurs after the liquidation of the virtual currency; repeal various sections of KRS Chapter 41 and KRS 42.510 related to the Linked Deposit Investment Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to financial administration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1038 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 80 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 125)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-25Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2019-02-21Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-20House3rd reading, passed 99-0
2019-02-15Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019
2019-02-15House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-14Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-11Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto State Government (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback