KY HB196 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 212 to define terms; establish requirements for residential swimming pool barriers, gates, and covers; establish exemptions of the residential swimming pool requirements; amend KRS 212.990 create penalties for violation of residential swimming pool requirement; provide that the Act may be cited as the Ava Grace Jenkins Law.
Title
AN ACT relating to swimming pool operational standards.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Bridges [R] | Rep. Jim Duplessis [R] | Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Rep. Bobby McCool [R] | Rep. Scott Sharp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-10 | House | returned to Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 10, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | floor amendment (2) filed |
2022-02-17 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-02-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-04 | House | introduced in House |