KY HB193 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.290 to prohibit a person from operating a vehicle in or near a highway work zone in a manner that endangers persons or property; provide that violators shall be subject to revocation of their operator's license; amend KRS 189.960 to require operators of motor vehicles yield to workers in or near a highway work zone; remove condition that workers must be present or that work is being performed for a violation to occur; amend KRS 189.2327 to increase fines for highway work zone traffic offenses; amend KRS 189.990 to establish fines for causing physical injury or death to a person while operating a vehicle in or near a highway work zone; amend KRS 189.010 to define "highway work zone"; amend KRS 186.560 to require revocation of an operator's license for certain highway work zones violations; amend KRS 189.2325 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles in a highway work zone.
Sponsors
Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 sfa3 sfa5 sfta4 RSN# 3083 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 131 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 131 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-27 | House | received in House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-3 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendments (3) and (5) and Floor Amendment (4-title) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Floor Amendments (1) and (2) Withdrawn |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | floor amendments (4-title) and (5) filed |
2024-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-21 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-21 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 21, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-14 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2024-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 22, 2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-30 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-01-25 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2024-01-08 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-08 | House | introduced in House |