KY HB190 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - floor amendment (2) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 158.148 to require that the code of acceptable behavior and discipline include appropriate reporting and escalation requirements of incidents of bullying, time requirements for investigation and response of incidents of bullying, and procedures for appeal and review of each incident of bullying.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24Housefloor amendment (2) filed
2020-01-22Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2020-01-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-17Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-13Houseposted in committee
2020-01-09Houseto Education (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback