KY HB19 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 189.930, to expand the requirement to move over or slow down when approaching an emergency or public safety vehicle to include any disabled vehicle displaying a warning signal.
Title
AN ACT relating to the operation of a motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa2 sfta1 RSN# 3078 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 54 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 54 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-27 | House | received in House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 28-7 with Floor Amendment (2) and Floor Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-25 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed |
2024-03-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-01-31 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2024-01-30 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 31, 2024 |
2024-01-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-01-18 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-02 | House | introduced in House |