KY HB177 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 205.5514 to require the Department for Medicaid Services to establish and implement a preferred drug list, reimbursement methodologies, and dispensing fees for Medicaid managed care organizations and the state pharmacy benefit manager within 30 days after the effective date of this Act; amend KRS 205.5518 to require Medicaid managed care organizations and pharmacy benefit managers to use reimbursement methodologies and dispensing fees established by the department for all Medicaid pharmacy benefit claims submitted on or after January 1, 2021; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to pharmacy benefits in the Medicaid program and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Sheldon [R] | Rep. Randy Bridges [R] | Rep. Derek Lewis [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Rep. Shawn McPherson [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Scott Sharp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-03-30 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-10 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Emergency
Health and Medical Services
Medicaid
Pharmacists
Public Medical Assistance
Retroactive Legislation
State Agencies
Drugs and Medicines
Effective Dates, Emergency
Health and Medical Services
Medicaid
Pharmacists
Public Medical Assistance
Retroactive Legislation
State Agencies
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/21RS/hb177.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/21RS/hb177/orig_bill.pdf |