KY HB175 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establish KRS Chapter 239 and create new sections to define “adjusted gross revenue,” “beginner,” “cabinet,” “commission,” “confidential information,” “entry fee,” “fantasy contest,” “fantasy contest operator, or operator,” “fantasy contest participant, or participant,” “highly experienced player,” “immediate family,” “location percentage,” “person,” “principal stockholder,” “registered fantasy contest operator,” “script,” “secretary,” and “wager”; establish requirements for registration as a fantasy contest operator; require the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations for the operation of fantasy contests; establish the wagering administration fund and direct the uses of that fund; establish the Kentucky problem gamblers assistance account and direct the uses of that fund; require an annual audit of fantasy contest registrants; establish requirements for fantasy contest procedures; amend KRS 230.210 to define sports wagering; create a new section of KRS Chapter 230 to require the racing commission to institute a system of sports wagering at tracks and other specified locations; create a new section of KRS Chapter 230 to limit the types of events upon which wagers may be placed; amend KRS 230.215 to declare the intent to allow citizens to enjoy sports wagering and allow the racing commission to promulgate administrative regulations prescribing conditions under which sports wagering is to be conducted; amend KRS 230.225, KRS 230.240, and KRS 230.260 to include sports wagering; create a new section of KRS Chapter 230 to establish sports wagering licensure requirements; amend KRS 230.320 to conform; amend KRS 230.361 to include sports wagering; amend KRS 230.3615 to conform; create a new section of KRS Chapter 138 to define “adjusted gross income” and impose a tax on sports wagering; amend KRS 230.362, KRS 230.363, KRS 230.364, KRS 230.365, KRS 230.366, KRS 230.369, KRS 230.371, KRS 230.372, KRS 230.373, KRS 230.374; and KRS 230.750 to conform; create a new section of KRS Chapter 230 to prohibit participants from wagering on events in which they participate and to prohibit tampering with the outcome of a sporting event; amend KRS 230.990 to provide penalties for participants who wager on sporting events and tampering with the outcome of a sporting event; amend KRS Chapter 154A.010 to define “net poker revenue,” “online poker,” and “rake”; amend KRS 154A.050 and KRS 154A.060 to include conducting online poker games; amend KRS 154A.063 to delete restriction on playing cards; amend KRS 154A.070 to include online poker; amend 154A.110 to prohibit anyone under 18 from placing a wager through an online poker game; amend KRS 154A.120 to include online poker; create a new section of KRS Chapter 154A to require licensure for online poker, require the Lottery Corporation to promulgate requirements for providers through administrative regulations, establish licensing fees, and impose a gaming fee on providers; establish a new section of KRS Chapter 154A to establish the Kentucky lottery corporation online poker account and provide for the uses of the funds deposited therein; amend KRS 154A.600 to include online poker; amend KRS 243.500 to exempt sports wagering and online poker; amend KRS 525.090 to exempt sports wagering; amend KRS 528.010 to exempt fantasy sports, sports wagering, and online poker and the devices used in the conduct of those forms of wagering; amend KRS 528.020, KRS 528.070, and KRS 528.080 to exempt fantasy sports, sports wagering, and online poker.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to wagering and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-08Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback