KY HB162 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 132.195 to exempt leasehold interests in property owned by a purely public charity when the property and income is used to further the purely public charity's mission; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to tax-exempt property of purely public charities and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 79 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22Senatefloor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed
2018-03-21Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute & committee amendment (1-title)
2018-03-20Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2018-03-20Senate1st reading
2018-03-20Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2018-02-05Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-02-02Senatereceived in Senate
2018-02-01House3rd reading, passed 87-0
2018-01-31Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 1, 2018
2018-01-31House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-30Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-01-24Houseposted in committee
2018-01-11Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-01-09Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback