KY HB160 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-23 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 382 to allow a homeowner to alter or construct a structure on his or her property for the accommodation or therapy of a disabled child, notwithstanding any private property restrictions to the contrary, if the construction or alteration is made upon the advice of a physician and otherwise complies with local, state, and federal law; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the protection of disabled children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2012-03-23 | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2012-02-16 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (3-title) filed | |
2012-02-15 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 16, 2012 | |
2012-02-09 | floor amendment (1-title) filed | |
2012-02-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-01-06 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-03 | to Local Government (H) | |
2012-01-03 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB160.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB160/bill.doc |