KY HB159 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - recommitted to Banking & Insurance (H)
Pending: House Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - recommitted to Banking & Insurance (H)
Pending: House Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of Subtitle 9 of KRS Chapter 304 to define terms; require title insurance agents to be licensed by the Department of Insurance; require a title insurance agent to provide a good-faith estimate of the premium upon the issuance of a title insurance commitment for a specified dollar amount; allow the commissioner to promulgate administrative regulations; amend KRS 304.9-030 to include title insurance as a type of insurance for which an agent may receive a qualification; amend KRS 304.22-030 to conform; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2018.
Title
AN ACT relating to title insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | House | recommitted to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2017-02-17 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2017-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-09 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-07 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2017-01-07 | House | introduced in House |