KY HB15 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 141.019 to increase the pension income exclusion from $31,110 to $41,110; declare this Act to apply retroactively for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2018; require the Department of Revenue to automatically issue refunds; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the taxation of pension income, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-10Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-09-20HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback