KY HB146 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-06 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 217 to create definitions and establish authority and standards for expedited partner therapy.
Title
AN ACT relating to expedited partner therapy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 58-28 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) |
2014-01-31 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 3, 2014 |
2014-01-31 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2014 |
2014-01-31 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-01-31 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-01-30 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2014-01-30 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-01-21 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-08 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |