KY HB143 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - recommitted to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - recommitted to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.444 to require the Kentucky Department of Education to establish a School Safety and Crisis Line; establish the operations of the School Safety and Crisis Line.
Title
AN ACT relating to a school safety and crisis line.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | House | recommitted to Education (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2018-01-18 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-08 | House | to Education (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | introduced in House |