KY HB141 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 67C.400 through 67C.418 to grant corrections officers of a consolidated local government the right to collectively bargain.
Title
AN ACT relating to corrections personnel in a consolidated local government.
Sponsors
Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-23 | floor amendments (3) and (4-title) filed | |
2011-02-17 | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed | |
2011-02-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2011 | |
2011-02-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-07 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-01 | reassigned to Labor & Industry (H) | |
2011-01-05 | to Local Government (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB141.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB141/bill.doc |