KY HB135 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 038)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 45A to set guidelines for awarding contracts for public works projects; set forth that public agencies awarding contracts shall not require or prohibit bidders to adhere to agreements with a labor organization relating to a public works project; set restrictions on a public agency in awarding a grant, tax abatement, or tax credit in situations contrary to the provisions of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to contracting of public works projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 926 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 39 (Y: 50 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 038)
2019-03-12Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-12Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-12Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-07Housereceived in House
2019-03-07Senate3rd reading, passed 26-10
2019-03-07Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-06Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-05Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-19Senateto Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2019-02-15Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-14House3rd reading, passed 50-44 with Committee Substitute
2019-02-11Housefloor amendments (1) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendments (2) and (4) filed to bill
2019-02-11Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 12, 2019
2019-02-07House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-06Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-01-11Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Local Government (H)
2019-01-09Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback