KY HB12 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - posted in committee
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - posted in committee
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to require the cabinet to regulate telehealth; set requirements for the delivery of telehealth services to Medicaid recipients; require equivalent reimbursement for telehealth services; require provision of coverage and reimbursement for telehealth; prohibit the cabinet from requiring providers to be physically present with a recipient; prohibit prior authorization, medical review, or administrative clearance if not required for the in-person service; prohibit demonstration of necessity; prohibit requiring providers to be part of a telehealth network; specify that Medicaid shall not be required to provide coverage for services that are not medically necessary or pay for transmission costs; amend KRS 205.510 to define terms; amend KRS 205.559 to add telehealth; amend 304.17A-005 to redefine "telehealth"; amend KRS 304.17A-138 to require health benefit plan coverage of telehealth to the same extent as though provided in person; prohibit health benefit plans from requiring providers to be physically present with a patient; prohibit prior authorization, medical review, or administrative clearance if not required for the in-person service; prohibit demonstration of necessity; prohibit requiring providers to be part of the telehealth network or subject to Telehealth Board oversight; specify that health benefit plans shall not be required to provide coverage for services that are not medically necessary or pay for transmission costs; amend KRS 342.315 to conform; amend KRS 18A.225 to require any fully insured health benefit plans or self-insured plans issued or renewed after July 1, 2019, to public employees to comply with KRS 304.17A-138; repeal KRS 194A.125; EFFECTIVE July 1, 2019.
Title
AN ACT relating to telehealth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-01 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB12.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB12/bill.pdf |