KY HB119 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]


Amend KRS 260.165, 260.166, and 260.167 to replace the Kentucky Grape and Wine Council fund with the Kentucky small farm wineries support fund; provide for the receipt and disbursement of Funds; amend KRS 260.175 to clarify requirements of the Kentucky small farm wineries support fund; create the Kentucky Grape and Wine Council Vineyard Expansion Reimbursement Grant Program; remove set program allocations; repeal KRS 260.168; APPROPRIATION.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Grape and Wine Council and making an appropriation therefor.



2018-02-15Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2018-02-15House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-14Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
2018-02-07Houseposted in committee
2018-01-05Houseto Agriculture (H)
2018-01-03Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources

Bill Comments